THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:08:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain medicine
2 maclaughlin pavillion, 405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4166035118
Fax: 4166036494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SANKET AGRAWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agrawal (CPSO#: 119395 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Dept of Anesthesia, Suite 405
McLaughlin Pavilion
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain medicine
2 maclaughlin pavillion, 405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4166035118
Fax: 4166036494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SANKET AGRAWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agrawal (CPSO#: 119395 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Dept of Anesthesia, Suite 405
McLaughlin Pavilion
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANKET ARUNKUMAR AGRAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGRAWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANKET ARUNKUMAR AGRAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGRAWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Oct 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019