THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Colston Ave
Whitby ON L1M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8662321212
Fax: 9056558536
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
Phone: 1-647-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507
Address: 162 Sandiford Dr
Stouffville ON L4A 3S3
Phone: 2894690323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Stefanoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stefanoff (CPSO#: 119396 )
Business Address: 90 Colston Avenue
Whitby Ontario L1M 1C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Colston Ave
Whitby ON L1M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8662321212
Fax: 9056558536
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
Phone: 1-647-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507
Address: 162 Sandiford Dr
Stouffville ON L4A 3S3
Phone: 2894690323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Stefanoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stefanoff (CPSO#: 119396 )
Business Address: 90 Colston Avenue
Whitby Ontario L1M 1C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY WILLIAM STEFANOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY WILLIAM STEFANOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019