THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:44:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade de Ciências Médicas de Minas Gerais (FCMMG), 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HUGO ISSA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Monteiro Neder Issa (CPSO#: 119402 )
Business Address: 303 Sherwood Dr
Ottawa ON K1Y 3W7
Business Address: 400 Pleasant Park Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Faculdade de Ciências Médicas de Minas Gerais (FCMMG), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HUGO ISSA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Monteiro Neder Issa (CPSO#: 119402 )
Business Address: 303 Sherwood Dr
Ottawa ON K1Y 3W7
Business Address: 400 Pleasant Park Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5N1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2023
31 Jul 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUGO MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 31 July, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUGO MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 31 July, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MONTEIRO NEDER ISSA's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade de Ciências Médicas de Minas Gerais (FCMMG), 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019