THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:11:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163403190
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163403190
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL SMITH may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL SMITH may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019