THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:00:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock Street
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
C3-027
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3415
Fax: (613) 545- 2202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAMIREZ HOBAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ramirez Hobak (CPSO#: 119447 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
613-544-3415

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock Street
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
C3-027
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3415
Fax: (613) 545- 2202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAMIREZ HOBAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ramirez Hobak (CPSO#: 119447 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
613-544-3415

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LOURDES RAMIREZ HOBAK may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Dermatology, Queen’s University, in which Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK's academic appointment at Queen’s University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LOURDES RAMIREZ HOBAK may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Dermatology, Queen’s University, in which Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAMIREZ HOBAK's academic appointment at Queen’s University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019