THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 104
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057260389
Fax: 7057258645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaitlyn Adare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Adare (CPSO#: 119480 )
Business Address: 125 Bell Farm Rd
Suite 104
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
7057260389

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 104
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057260389
Fax: 7057258645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaitlyn Adare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Adare (CPSO#: 119480 )
Business Address: 125 Bell Farm Rd
Suite 104
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
7057260389

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLYN ELIZABETH ADARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLYN ELIZABETH ADARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019