THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Pediatric Clinic
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: 2899662800
Fax: 8449291554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Pediatric Clinic
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: 2899662800
Fax: 8449291554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAMUS MOORE MAC FARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAC FARLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAMUS MOORE MAC FARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAC FARLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019