THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ohio Univ College of Osteopathic Med, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-7001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: College Medical Care
343 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Albana Dreshaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dreshaj (CPSO#: 119516 )
Business Address: 343 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5
(416) 519-9086
Business Address: Suite 226
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 232-7001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ohio Univ College of Osteopathic Med, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-7001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: College Medical Care
343 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Albana Dreshaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dreshaj (CPSO#: 119516 )
Business Address: 343 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5
(416) 519-9086
Business Address: Suite 226
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 232-7001

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALBANA DRESHAJ may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALBANA DRESHAJ may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ohio Univ College of Osteopathic Med, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019