THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 06:47:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pathology
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 8642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 08 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jad Saab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saab (CPSO#: 119532 )

Corporation Name: MITROVIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McClure (CPSO#: 101763 ) Dr. J. Saab (CPSO#: 119532 ) Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon (CPSO#: 102034 ) Dr. B. Mitrovic (CPSO#: 91572 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pathology
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 8642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 08 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jad Saab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saab (CPSO#: 119532 )

Corporation Name: MITROVIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McClure (CPSO#: 101763 ) Dr. J. Saab (CPSO#: 119532 ) Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon (CPSO#: 102034 ) Dr. B. Mitrovic (CPSO#: 91572 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Nov 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 27 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAD SAAB may practise medicine independently in general pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAD SAAB may practise medicine independently in general pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019