THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Laboratory Medicine and Genetics
2H628
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Extension: 2335
Fax: 905 813 4132
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Laboratory Medicine and Genetics
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 08 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eiad Kahwash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kahwash (CPSO#: 119535 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Laboratory Medicine and Genetics
2H628
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Extension: 2335
Fax: 905 813 4132
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Laboratory Medicine and Genetics
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 08 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eiad Kahwash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kahwash (CPSO#: 119535 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Dec 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 10 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. EIAD KAHWASH may practise medicine independently in hematological pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. EIAD KAHWASH may practise medicine independently in hematological pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019