THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:41:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Lue-Quee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lue-Quee (CPSO#: 119564 )
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Lue-Quee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lue-Quee (CPSO#: 119564 )
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LUE-QUEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUE-QUEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LUE-QUEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUE-QUEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019