THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:12:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
24 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 24 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019