THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Winderemere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEEPA DASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dash (CPSO#: 119701 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
519 663 3187

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Winderemere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEEPA DASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dash (CPSO#: 119701 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
519 663 3187

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DEEPA DASH may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences, Division of Neurology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. DASH holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DASH no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DASH’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DASH’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 October, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. DASH's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DEEPA DASH may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences, Division of Neurology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. DASH holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DASH no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DASH’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DASH’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 October, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. DASH's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019