THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:29:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 841 8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL MEDECINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daniel (CPSO#: 119710 )
Business Address: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 841 8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL MEDECINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daniel (CPSO#: 119710 )
Business Address: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE PATRICIA DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE PATRICIA DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019