THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculte de Medecine de Tunis, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SABRI SOUSSI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soussi (CPSO#: 119733 )
Business Address: 4372481980

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Faculte de Medecine de Tunis, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SABRI SOUSSI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soussi (CPSO#: 119733 )
Business Address: 4372481980

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2023
28 Feb 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 28 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMED SABRI SOUSSI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SOUSSI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SOUSSI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SOUSSI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SOUSSI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 28 February, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMED SABRI SOUSSI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SOUSSI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SOUSSI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SOUSSI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SOUSSI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 28 February, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculte de Medecine de Tunis, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 28 Feb 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2019