THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:11:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6512
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Okigbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Okigbo (CPSO#: 119741 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6512
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Okigbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Okigbo (CPSO#: 119741 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN IFEOMA OKIGBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKIGBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN IFEOMA OKIGBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKIGBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019