THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:34:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Apr 2025
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 04 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ASSAF KADAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. KADAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KADAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KADAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KADAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. KADAR's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ASSAF KADAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. KADAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KADAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KADAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KADAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. KADAR's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2019