THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Of Parma, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 108-219 Fort York Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M5V 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 416-594-1919
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Eroume A Egom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Eroume A Egom (CPSO#: 119772 )
Business Address: 1 - 3470 Laird Road
Suite 1
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5Y4
(905) 820-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University Of Parma, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 108-219 Fort York Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M5V 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 416-594-1919
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Eroume A Egom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Eroume A Egom (CPSO#: 119772 )
Business Address: 1 - 3470 Laird Road
Suite 1
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5Y4
(905) 820-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL EROUME A EGOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EROUME A EGOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL EROUME A EGOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EROUME A EGOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Of Parma, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019