THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:25:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Copeland Ave
David Braley Research Institute
Office - C1 - 109
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40683
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.N. OFORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ofori (CPSO#: 119784 )
Business Address: 20 Copeland Ave
Office - C1 - 109
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 40683

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Copeland Ave
David Braley Research Institute
Office - C1 - 109
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40683
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.N. OFORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ofori (CPSO#: 119784 )
Business Address: 20 Copeland Ave
Office - C1 - 109
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 40683

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Mar 2025
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 11 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SANDRA NNEDINMA OFORI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. OFORI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. OFORI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. OFORI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. OFORI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. OFORI's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SANDRA NNEDINMA OFORI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. OFORI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. OFORI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. OFORI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. OFORI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. OFORI's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019