THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 21:11:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. White (CPSO#: 119788 )
Business Address: 1960 Scott St
Suite 1410
Ottawa ON K1Z 0C5
19024710788
Business Address: 200-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
(613) 686-3378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. White (CPSO#: 119788 )
Business Address: 1960 Scott St
Suite 1410
Ottawa ON K1Z 0C5
19024710788
Business Address: 200-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
(613) 686-3378

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN JONATHAN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN JONATHAN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2019