THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
Tower C
ROOM 303
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. B.A. LOWRY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lowry (CPSO#: 119807 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
Tower C
ROOM 303
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. B.A. LOWRY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lowry (CPSO#: 119807 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE ANDREW LOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE ANDREW LOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2019