THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Taipei Medical College, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 7894
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 08 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.Y. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Huang (CPSO#: 119818 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room E432
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Taipei Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 7894
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 08 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.Y. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Huang (CPSO#: 119818 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room E432
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEEI YUARN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WEEI YUARN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Taipei Medical College, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019