THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:20:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Copper Ridge Medical Centre
3B - 8015 Financial Dr
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-9005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Javaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javaid (CPSO#: 119821 )
Business Address: 8015 Financial Drive
Suite B4
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6A1
(905) 456-9005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Copper Ridge Medical Centre
3B - 8015 Financial Dr
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-9005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Javaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javaid (CPSO#: 119821 )
Business Address: 8015 Financial Drive
Suite B4
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6A1
(905) 456-9005

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AREEJ JAVAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVAID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AREEJ JAVAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVAID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2019