THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:42:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Division of Critical Care Medicine
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NASIM ZAMIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zamir (CPSO#: 119861 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Division of Critical Care Medicine
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NASIM ZAMIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zamir (CPSO#: 119861 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASIM ZAMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASIM ZAMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019