THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Muskoka Road North
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056878523
Fax: 7056878289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipriani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cipriani (CPSO#: 119882 )
Business Address: 205 Muskoka Road North
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1X2
+1 705-687-9300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Muskoka Road North
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056878523
Fax: 7056878289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipriani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cipriani (CPSO#: 119882 )
Business Address: 205 Muskoka Road North
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1X2
+1 705-687-9300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINALD ANTHONY CIPRIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPRIANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINALD ANTHONY CIPRIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPRIANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019