THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:53:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third St
Niagara Health System- Welland Site
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 142 Queenston St
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
St. Catharines ON L2R 2Z7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 17 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. SURESH PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suresh (CPSO#: 119886 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third St
Niagara Health System- Welland Site
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 142 Queenston St
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
St. Catharines ON L2R 2Z7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 17 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. SURESH PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suresh (CPSO#: 119886 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANARTHANEE SURESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURESH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANARTHANEE SURESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURESH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019