THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:47:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3570 King St E
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 11 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Tchajkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tchajkova (CPSO#: 119911 )
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3570 King St E
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 11 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Tchajkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tchajkova (CPSO#: 119911 )
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALJA TCHAJKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TCHAJKOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALJA TCHAJKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TCHAJKOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2019