THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Paris, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
C2 - Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Paris, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
C2 - Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT FAHED may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT FAHED may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Paris, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 11 Sep 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 11 Sep 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019