THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Mount Pleasant Clinic
Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-826-3005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Chanana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chanana (CPSO#: 119936 )
Business Address: 697 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1B2
6474502529
Business Address: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Mount Pleasant Clinic
Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
437-826-3005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Mount Pleasant Clinic
Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-826-3005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Chanana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chanana (CPSO#: 119936 )
Business Address: 697 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1B2
6474502529
Business Address: 245 Eglinton Avenue East
Mount Pleasant Clinic
Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M4P 3B7
437-826-3005

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAY CHANANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAY CHANANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019