THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Rd E
Unit 110
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-255-2504
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurpreet Chara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chara (CPSO#: 119952 )
Business Address: 110-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Rd E
Unit 110
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-255-2504
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurpreet Chara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chara (CPSO#: 119952 )
Business Address: 110-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH CHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH CHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019