THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:26:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 University Ave
Office 8-163-2
UHN Toronto Rehabilitation
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Farag (CPSO#: 119958 )
Business Address: 550 University Ave
Office 8-163-2
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
4165973422 Extn: 3343

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 University Ave
Office 8-163-2
UHN Toronto Rehabilitation
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Farag (CPSO#: 119958 )
Business Address: 550 University Ave
Office 8-163-2
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
4165973422 Extn: 3343

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN IWASA FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN IWASA FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019