THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sethi, Lisha (Used Until: 16 Mar 2022)
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-4525 Ebenezer Rd
Brampton ON L6P 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057942003
Fax: 9057942054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisha Chander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chander (CPSO#: 119970 )
Business Address: 1-4525 Ebenezer Rd
Brampton ON L6P 2K8

General Information

Former Name: Sethi, Lisha (Used Until: 16 Mar 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-4525 Ebenezer Rd
Brampton ON L6P 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057942003
Fax: 9057942054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisha Chander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chander (CPSO#: 119970 )
Business Address: 1-4525 Ebenezer Rd
Brampton ON L6P 2K8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISHA CHANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISHA CHANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019