THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:32:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905-687-1855
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-682-6451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 119979 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9056826451
Business Address: 2-403 Ontario St
St Catharines ON L2N 1L5
9059848766 Extn: 263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905-687-1855
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-682-6451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 119979 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9056826451
Business Address: 2-403 Ontario St
St Catharines ON L2N 1L5
9059848766 Extn: 263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD UZ ZAMAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD UZ ZAMAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019