THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:53:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shanza Waqar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waqar (CPSO#: 119997 )
Business Address: 221 Glendale Ave
Inside Walmart
9056874252

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shanza Waqar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waqar (CPSO#: 119997 )
Business Address: 221 Glendale Ave
Inside Walmart
9056874252

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
25 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 25 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from March 25, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shanza Waqar in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Waqar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. SHANZA WAQAR
(“Dr. Waqar”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Waqar practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Waqar, certificate of registration number 119997, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-422957-J3Z6R6 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my internal medicine practice, including in my delegation to non-members.
(4) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the ICRC will also require me to appear before a panel of the ICRC to be cautioned.

B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(6) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Individualized instruction in professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(ii) Review, reflection and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy;
2. Delegation of Controlled Acts, College policy;
3. Delegation to Physician Assistants, College policy;
4. Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice, College policy;
(iii) Review of, and reflection on, the following practice tools:
1. Physician Schedule of Benefits: Physician Services Under the Health Insurance Act, Ministry of Health and Long Term Care;
2. CanMEDS-PA and Competencies for the Physician Assistant Profession, Canadian Association of Physician Assistants;
(iv) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Medical Records Documentation, College policy;
2. Good Practices – Physician-Patient: Documentation and record keeping, Canadian Medical Protective Association.
(b) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(13) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Waqar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of internal medicine, including in her delegation to non-members. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Waqar will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, billing in accordance with OHIP guidelines, and delegation of controlled acts.
(c) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(17) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

Dr. SHANZA WAQAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from March 25, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shanza Waqar in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Waqar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. SHANZA WAQAR
(“Dr. Waqar”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Waqar practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Waqar, certificate of registration number 119997, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-422957-J3Z6R6 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my internal medicine practice, including in my delegation to non-members.
(4) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the ICRC will also require me to appear before a panel of the ICRC to be cautioned.

B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(6) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Individualized instruction in professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(ii) Review, reflection and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy;
2. Delegation of Controlled Acts, College policy;
3. Delegation to Physician Assistants, College policy;
4. Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice, College policy;
(iii) Review of, and reflection on, the following practice tools:
1. Physician Schedule of Benefits: Physician Services Under the Health Insurance Act, Ministry of Health and Long Term Care;
2. CanMEDS-PA and Competencies for the Physician Assistant Profession, Canadian Association of Physician Assistants;
(iv) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Medical Records Documentation, College policy;
2. Good Practices – Physician-Patient: Documentation and record keeping, Canadian Medical Protective Association.
(b) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(13) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Waqar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of internal medicine, including in her delegation to non-members. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Waqar will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, billing in accordance with OHIP guidelines, and delegation of controlled acts.
(c) I, Dr. Waqar, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(17) I, Dr. Waqar, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

Dr. SHANZA WAQAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shanza Waqar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 25, 2025:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Waqar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of internal medicine, including in her delegation to non-members. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Waqar will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, billing in accordance with OHIP guidelines, and delegation of controlled acts.
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2025
Summary:
Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX6R6
 
Caution-in-Person: 
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shanza Waqar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 25, 2025:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Waqar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of internal medicine, including in her delegation to non-members. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Waqar will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, billing in accordance with OHIP guidelines, and delegation of controlled acts.
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2025
Summary:
Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX6R6
 
Caution-in-Person: 
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   

Training

Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Mar 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019