THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 01:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Square One Medical
4175 Confederation Pky
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058484880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richa Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharma (CPSO#: 119999 )
Business Address: 4175 Confederation Pky
Suite 2
Mississauga ON L5B 0H1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Square One Medical
4175 Confederation Pky
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058484880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richa Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharma (CPSO#: 119999 )
Business Address: 4175 Confederation Pky
Suite 2
Mississauga ON L5B 0H1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RICHA SHARMA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RICHA SHARMA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019