THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 Victoria Park Ave
Victoria Commons Medical Clinic
Unit 6
Scarborough ON M1T 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 551 7069
Fax: 647 689 4621
Address: 61-1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Phone: (647) 428-4885
Fax: 416-445-5025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gorden Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fu (CPSO#: 120009 )
Business Address: 6-2555 Victoria Park Ave
Scarborough ON M1T 1A3
416 551 7069

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 Victoria Park Ave
Victoria Commons Medical Clinic
Unit 6
Scarborough ON M1T 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 551 7069
Fax: 647 689 4621
Address: 61-1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Phone: (647) 428-4885
Fax: 416-445-5025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gorden Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fu (CPSO#: 120009 )
Business Address: 6-2555 Victoria Park Ave
Scarborough ON M1T 1A3
416 551 7069

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 11 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GORDEN CHUN-KIT FU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GORDEN CHUN-KIT FU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2019