THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:09:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Tree Clinic
795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138878733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naresh Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sood (CPSO#: 120015 )
Business Address: 795 Gardiners Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6
(613) 887-8733
Business Address: 1219 Wheathill St
Kingston ON K7M 0G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Government Medical College, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Tree Clinic
795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138878733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naresh Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sood (CPSO#: 120015 )
Business Address: 795 Gardiners Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6
(613) 887-8733
Business Address: 1219 Wheathill St
Kingston ON K7M 0G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2019