THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:09:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H H S C
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 43882
Fax: 905-389-0108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fernandes (CPSO#: 120041 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H H S C
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 43882
Fax: 905-389-0108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fernandes (CPSO#: 120041 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Jun 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 11 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AARON FERNANDES may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AARON FERNANDES may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2019