THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:53:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Friedrich Alexander Univ of Erlangen, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500-379 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 8R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 240 4678
Extension: 1
Fax: 9052407334
Address: Intrepid Medical Centre
379 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8R7
Phone: 905-240-4678
Fax: 905-240-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Numfor Neba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Numfor (CPSO#: 120044 )
Business Address: 500-379 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 8R7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Friedrich Alexander Univ of Erlangen, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500-379 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 8R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 240 4678
Extension: 1
Fax: 9052407334
Address: Intrepid Medical Centre
379 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8R7
Phone: 905-240-4678
Fax: 905-240-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Numfor Neba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Numfor (CPSO#: 120044 )
Business Address: 500-379 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 8R7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEBA TAMANJI NUMFOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMFOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEBA TAMANJI NUMFOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMFOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Friedrich Alexander Univ of Erlangen, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019