THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:36:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halo Medical Clinic
B7 - 2727 Courtice Rd
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052331919
Fax: 9052408550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Adiele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Adiele (CPSO#: 120048 )
Business Address: 2727 Courtice Road
Suite B7
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halo Medical Clinic
B7 - 2727 Courtice Rd
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052331919
Fax: 9052408550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Adiele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Adiele (CPSO#: 120048 )
Business Address: 2727 Courtice Road
Suite B7
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDOZIE CHIMA ADIELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDOZIE CHIMA ADIELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2019