THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Victor Babes University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Anesthesia Department
101 Humber College BLVD
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AWAD AHMED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Awad (CPSO#: 120054 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Victor Babes University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Anesthesia Department
101 Humber College BLVD
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AWAD AHMED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Awad (CPSO#: 120054 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Nov 2024
27 Nov 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 28 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 27 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AHMED F M AWAD may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Hospital and Institutional Care, Division of Anesthesia, Toronto Metropolitan University, in which Dr. AWAD holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AWAD no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AWAD’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AWAD’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 November, 2024, and expires on 27 November, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. AWAD's academic appointment at Toronto Metropolitan University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AHMED F M AWAD may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Hospital and Institutional Care, Division of Anesthesia, Toronto Metropolitan University, in which Dr. AWAD holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AWAD no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AWAD’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AWAD’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 November, 2024, and expires on 27 November, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. AWAD's academic appointment at Toronto Metropolitan University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Victor Babes University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Nov 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020