THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-4949 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 633 4984
Fax: 416 633 4446
Address: 26 Bingham St
26 Holland St East
Bradford ON L3Z 1X2
Phone: (905) 7752025
Fax: (905) 775-2026
Address: 5-10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 237-8630
Fax: (905) 237-8632
Address: 10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
Phone: 905-237-8630
Fax: 905-237-8632
Address: 4949 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-633-4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amir Zohrab-Beik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zohrab Beik (CPSO#: 120056 )
Business Address: 4949 Bathurst St
Suite 212
North York ON M2R 1Y1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-4949 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 633 4984
Fax: 416 633 4446
Address: 26 Bingham St
26 Holland St East
Bradford ON L3Z 1X2
Phone: (905) 7752025
Fax: (905) 775-2026
Address: 5-10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 237-8630
Fax: (905) 237-8632
Address: 10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
Phone: 905-237-8630
Fax: 905-237-8632
Address: 4949 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-633-4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amir Zohrab-Beik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zohrab Beik (CPSO#: 120056 )
Business Address: 4949 Bathurst St
Suite 212
North York ON M2R 1Y1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ZOHRAB BEIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOHRAB BEIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ZOHRAB BEIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOHRAB BEIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019