THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Kensington Rd
Suite 504
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 2168256
Fax: (905) 2168222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liana R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Singh (CPSO#: 120062 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 308
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Address: 504-18 Kensington Rd
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
9052168256

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Kensington Rd
Suite 504
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 2168256
Fax: (905) 2168222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liana R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Singh (CPSO#: 120062 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 308
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Address: 504-18 Kensington Rd
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
9052168256

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANA RENEE SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANA RENEE SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2019