THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Green Bay Medical Center
3015 Winston Churchill blvd
unit 101A
Mississauga Ontario L5L2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 9978077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
Phone: 905-844-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saad Bahodi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bahodi (CPSO#: 120065 )
Business Address: 3015 Winston Churchhill Boulevard
Suite 101A
Mississauga Ontario L5L 2V8
(905) 997-8077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Green Bay Medical Center
3015 Winston Churchill blvd
unit 101A
Mississauga Ontario L5L2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 9978077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
Phone: 905-844-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saad Bahodi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bahodi (CPSO#: 120065 )
Business Address: 3015 Winston Churchhill Boulevard
Suite 101A
Mississauga Ontario L5L 2V8
(905) 997-8077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAD MICHAEL ANTOWAN BAHODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHODI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAD MICHAEL ANTOWAN BAHODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHODI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020