THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Robinson (CPSO#: 120104 )
Business Address: 3662 Sawmill Valley Dr

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Robinson (CPSO#: 120104 )
Business Address: 3662 Sawmill Valley Dr

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NICHOLAS ALEXANDER ROBINSON may practise medicine independently in internal medicine as a hospitalist.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NICHOLAS ALEXANDER ROBINSON may practise medicine independently in internal medicine as a hospitalist.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2019