THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266474447
Fax: 2266663661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Teriba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teriba (CPSO#: 120115 )
Business Address: 820 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 4G8
5192060211
Business Address: 2-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
2266474447

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266474447
Fax: 2266663661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Teriba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teriba (CPSO#: 120115 )
Business Address: 820 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 4G8
5192060211
Business Address: 2-535 Park St
Kitchener ON N2G 1N8
2266474447

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETOKUNBO TERIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERIBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETOKUNBO TERIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERIBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2019