THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NTR University of Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1671 Howard Ave
BLOSSOM N THRIVE Internal Medicine
Endocrinology and Metabolism Clinic
blossomnthrive.ca
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-2323
Fax: (519) 253-2626
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette campus
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan campus
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas Mohammad Riyazuddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mohammad Riyazuddin (CPSO#: 120131 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1671 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: NTR University of Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1671 Howard Ave
BLOSSOM N THRIVE Internal Medicine
Endocrinology and Metabolism Clinic
blossomnthrive.ca
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-2323
Fax: (519) 253-2626
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette campus
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan campus
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas Mohammad Riyazuddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mohammad Riyazuddin (CPSO#: 120131 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1671 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIRAS MOHAMMAD RIYAZUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMAD RIYAZUDDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIRAS MOHAMMAD RIYAZUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMAD RIYAZUDDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NTR University of Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2019