THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:14:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1474 Pickwick Dr
Mississauga ON L5V 2G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058130477
Fax: 9058170098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Goher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goher (CPSO#: 120139 )
Business Address: 1474 Pickwick Dr
Unit 5B
Mississauga ON L5V 2G2
9058130477
Business Address: 802 Southdown Road
Suite C4
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1474 Pickwick Dr
Mississauga ON L5V 2G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058130477
Fax: 9058170098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Goher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goher (CPSO#: 120139 )
Business Address: 1474 Pickwick Dr
Unit 5B
Mississauga ON L5V 2G2
9058130477
Business Address: 802 Southdown Road
Suite C4
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABER RIAD LABIB GOHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABER RIAD LABIB GOHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2019