THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163029751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurpaul Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bajwa (CPSO#: 120147 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3

Corporation Name: Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163029751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurpaul Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bajwa (CPSO#: 120147 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3

Corporation Name: Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPAUL SINGH BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPAUL SINGH BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2019