THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056832320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Eglinton Healthcare Center
2950 Eglinton Ave E, Scarborough, ON M1J 2E7
Phone Number: 416-438-6633
Fax: 416-438-3633
Date Received: 05 Sep 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinoja Vanniyasingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vanniyasingam (CPSO#: 120150 )
Business Address: 2950 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 1
Scarborough ON M1J2E7
4164386633
Business Address: 2000 Simcoe Street North
Campus Recreation and Wellness Centre 2000 Simcoe St N, Rm G1030 Oshawa, ON L1H 7K4
Oshawa Ontario L1G 0C5
6477845379

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056832320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Eglinton Healthcare Center
2950 Eglinton Ave E, Scarborough, ON M1J 2E7
Phone Number: 416-438-6633
Fax: 416-438-3633
Date Received: 05 Sep 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinoja Vanniyasingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vanniyasingam (CPSO#: 120150 )
Business Address: 2950 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 1
Scarborough ON M1J2E7
4164386633
Business Address: 2000 Simcoe Street North
Campus Recreation and Wellness Centre 2000 Simcoe St N, Rm G1030 Oshawa, ON L1H 7K4
Oshawa Ontario L1G 0C5
6477845379

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINOJA VANNIYASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNIYASINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINOJA VANNIYASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNIYASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019